SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to sick and elderly priests
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of Westminster
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southwark
Governance
- 05 August 1964: Standard registration
- LITTLE 'M' (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael O'DEA | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Cooke | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rothon | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|||||
The Reverend Canon Jonathan Martin | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|||||
FATHER KEVIN HALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN ROTHON MA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.73k | £55.98k | £52.05k | £163.06k | £47.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.94k | £95.36k | £91.20k | £88.23k | £88.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JANUARY 1864 AND RULES ADOPTED 1952
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD ASSISTANCE TO THE AGED, SICK AND INFIRM OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH IN THE METROPOLITAN DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER AND DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK,PORTSMOUTH AND BRENTWOOD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MARY'S
5 CRESSWELL PARK
BLACKHEATH
LONDON
SE3 9RD
- Phone:
- 02088525420
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window