BREWOOD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The welfare of elderly/old people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA ANN WELLSBURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PHYLLIS JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE STINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE MAY HOLMES | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHLEEN ANN POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALICE YVONNE MILLWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £489 | £786 | £469 | £761 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £1.18k | £1.24k | £1.22k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7 MAY 1953
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE OF BREWOOD, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, BY ENDEAVOURING TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND BY PURSUING ANY OBJECTS THAT MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BREWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 HALL FARM ROAD
BREWOOD
STAFFORD
ST19 9EZ
- Phone:
- 01902850421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window