THE W H JONES CHARITY FUND
Charity number: 217895
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Payment of grants to individuals under certain circumstances to ease financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Total income: £1,131
Total expenditure: £2,001
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Wolverhampton
Governance
Registration history:
- 15 August 1967: Standard registration
- 30 August 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 August 2019: Funds transferred to 1180065 THE MAYOR OF WOLVERHAMPTON'S CHARITABLE FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE W H JONES BLANKET CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.34k | £1.33k | £950 | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £21.10k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 06 August 2019 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 20 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 21 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 13 NOVEMBER 1974 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window