NEWCASTLE ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 217917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Accomodation/housing for the elderley and disabled

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,915
Total expenditure: £19,651

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS GILL WILLIAMS Chair
None on record
Joan Winfield Trustee 31 May 2016
None on record
Alan Rushton Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
NICK BUTLER Trustee
None on record
COUNCILLOR JOHN WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
COUNCILLOR MRS SYLVIA TERESA BUTLER BA HONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.08k £15.93k £17.81k £18.58k £18.92k
Total expenditure £19.69k £19.53k £6.17k £40.77k £19.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME BC
CASTLE HOUSE
BARRACKS ROAD
NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST5 1BL
Phone:
01782742112
Website:

No information available