DR. CHARLES BAMFORD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust administers six small retirement dwellings (three pairs of semi-detached bungalows) for people from Uttoxeter and district who need them. They also rent out a building for the use of community based groups and meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 October 1967: Standard registration
- THE HERMITAGE BUNGALOWS (Working name)
- THE DOCTOR CHARLES BAMFORD MEMORIAL HOMES OF REST (Previous name)
- THE HERMITAGE CHARITY CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Hanson | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HEADECH | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER SIMON COFFIN | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA BENNETT | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES STEPHEN WILKS | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARENKA ANNA SICHA | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW EADIE | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH LEEDHAM | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £948.00k | £1.06m | £828.21k | £16.27k | £36.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £932.46k | £223.22k | £1.23m | £11.56k | £35.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £187.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £104.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £37.21k | £104.63k | £23.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £910.58k | £955.59k | £576.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £221 | £0 | £840 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £227.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £932.46k | £0 | £1.23m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.31k | £0 | £452.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £223.22k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2023 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
25 November 2023 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
25 November 2023 | 663 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 MARCH 2008 as amended on 13 Jan 2025 as amended on 13 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1) (A) THE PROVISIONS OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS IN NEED WHO: I) WERE BORN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR II) HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS. B) THE PROVISION OF CARE FOR PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF A RESIDENTIAL CARE HOME KNOWN AS "THE HERMITAGE". 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR OBJECT 1 OF THE CHARITY. 3) IF THE PROPERTY IDENTIFIED IN PART 3 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME IS NO LONGER REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION OF A RESIDENTIAL CARE HOME, THE OBJECT WILL BE THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER URBAN AND RURAL DISTRICTS OF UTTOXETER AND WITHIN A RADIUS OF 5 MILES FROM THE PARISH CHURCH OF UTTOXETER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hermitage Gardens
UTTOXETER
Staffordshire
ST14 7DT
- Phone:
- 07850280117
- Email:
- marjoriehollins@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window