THE DOCTOR CHARLES BAMFORD CONVALESCENT HOME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hermitage provides accommodation and care for up to 11 ladies from the local area, who are over the age of 65, and have found it difficult or impossible to continue managing in their own homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 27 September 1963: Standard registration
- 06 March 2008: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 March 2008: Funds transferred to 217924 DR. CHARLES BAMFORD CHARITY
- THE HERMITAGE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.18k | £155.84k | £220.30k | £206.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.41k | £215.97k | £240.33k | £253.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 01 February 2008 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 April 2007 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 April 2007 | 78 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1938 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24TH NOVEMBER 2005 AND AN ORDER OF 17 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
CONVALESCENT HOME FOR WOMEN NOT REQUIRING PROFESSIONAL NURSING
Area of benefit
UTTOXETER AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window