BARTON UNDER NEEDWOOD AND DUNSTALL KEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay the minister of the church of St James 50p to preach a sermon on Good Friday. To pay 16% of the net income of the charity for the upkeep and maintenance of St James Church of Barton under Needwood. To give relief to persons of the parishes of Barton under Needwood and Dunstall who are in need, hardship or distress. To give for the general benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 25 July 1963: Standard registration
- CHARITY OF WILLIAM KEY (Previous name)
- WILLIAM KEY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE MARY JONES | Chair | 17 November 2011 |
|
|||||
Simon William Clarke | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Edward James Sharkey | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Cowgill | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Lawrence Holder | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Frazer Cunningham | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Christopher Mole | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Simpson | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Rosina Maria van Daesdonk | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID OBIEFUNA CHUKWUEMEKA OKOYE | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.07k | £81.99k | £95.36k | £99.43k | £101.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.01k | £63.85k | £61.21k | £67.72k | £108.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 OCT 2017 as amended on 14 May 2021
Charitable objects
(I) TO PAY THE MINISTER AT THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JAMES BARTON UNDER NEEDWOOD A YEARLY SUM OF 50P FOR THE PREACHING OF A SERMON ON GOOD FRIDAY EACH YEAR. (II) THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH AT BARTON-UNDER-NEEDWOOD BY THE PAYMENT OF 16% OF THE CHARITY'S NET INCOME TO THE PCC FOR THAT PURPOSE; (III)THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (IV) THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE CIVIL PARISHES OF DUNSTALL AND BARTON-UNDER-NEEDWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hardy Close
Barton Under Needwood
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE13 8HG
- Phone:
- 01283 716890
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window