ALL SAINTS GRANGE BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees are responsible for an area of woodland which have preservation orders on the trees with no means of income. There is also a bowling green which is used by the people of clayton le moors both young and old.The trustees activities are to maintain the preservation order on the trees by any means at their disposal if work is to be done in the woodland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 June 1963: Standard registration
- PARISH CHURCH INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Royston Plumbley The Grange Bowling Club | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev TOBY WEBBER | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Schofield | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew McMinn | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Laurence Denton | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2024 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1911 AS AMENDED 6 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CLERICAL, RELIGIOUS, CHARITABLE OR BENEVOLENT PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE WORK OF THE PARISH CHURCH OR ANY OTHER PURPOSE CALCULATED TO IMPROVE THE MORAL, SOCIAL OR INTELLECTUAL CONDITIONS OF THE POPULATION OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
CLAYTON-LE-MOORS
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 KINGSWAY
CHURCH
ACCRINGTON
BB5 5EL
- Phone:
- 01254232299
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window