Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN RUGBY

Charity number: 217993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 16 February 2006 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 30 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 24 February 2005 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 13 December 2004 On Time