CITY OF BIRMINGHAM ORCHESTRAL ENDOWMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has been established for the purpose of encouraging and supporting symphonic or classical orchestral music and promoting musical performances not for profit & cultivating musical education in the city of Birmingham , in particular supporting CBSO
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 August 1964: Standard registration
- 09 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 April 2024: Funds transferred to 506276 CITY OF BIRMINGHAM SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.60k | £83.64k | £59.20k | £113.25k | £173.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.34k | £134.37k | £83.15k | £48.05k | £3.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 7 DECEMBER 1950
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING ORCHESTRAL MUSIC OF A SYMPHONIC OR CLASSICAL CHARACTER AND FOR THE PROMOTION OF MUSICAL PERFORMANCES NOT CONDUCTED FOR PROFIT AND OF SUCH A STANDARD AS WILL FURTHER THE CULTIVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND THE MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window