SHREWSBURY SECULAR CLERGY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim of the Charity is the care of sick clergy and retired clergy of Shrewsbury Catholic Diocese (who are members of the fund) through financial grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Manchester City
- Shropshire
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Telford & Wrekin
- Trafford
- Wirral
- Ireland
Governance
- 10 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GEORGE EDWARD JOSEPH BROWNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL EUGENE HARTLEY | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROGER THOMAS CLARKE | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev PATRICK JOSEPH MUNROE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev JONATHAN DAVID MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev STEPHEN KARL WOOLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.29k | £28.12k | £51.48k | £66.91k | £34.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.75k | £59.70k | £72.44k | £65.21k | £63.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1872 REVISED JULY 1899,JULY 1916,JULY 1933,FEBRUARY 1940,JULY 1952,22 JUNE 1971,13 JUNE 1972 AND 17 JUNE 1980. AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF AGED AND INFIRM PRIESTS, WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE FUND.
Area of benefit
ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Milburgh
Watling Street North
Church Stretton
SY6 7AR
- Phone:
- 07590196795
- Email:
- frjonmitchell@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window