Governing document SHREWSBURY SECULAR CLERGY FUND
Charity number: 218087

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1872 REVISED JULY 1899,JULY 1916,JULY 1933,FEBRUARY 1940,JULY 1952,22 JUNE 1971,13 JUNE 1972 AND 17 JUNE 1980. AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF AGED AND INFIRM PRIESTS, WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE FUND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.