Register of Charities - The Charity Commission HUMPHREY BROWN
Charity number: 252194-7
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
1) YEARLY SUM OF 50P TO THE RECTOR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES THE LESS, IRON ACTON FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON MIDSUMMER'S DAY. 2) REMAINDER FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY. PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 8 APRIL 1969 REGISTERED UNDER 254454
Area of benefit
PARISH OF IRON ACTON
Registration history
- 28 November 1967: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 September 2014: Re-registered
- 09 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.