LEONARD CHESHIRE DISABILITY

Charity number: 218186
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide effective and efficient community based services to disabled people that respond to their preferences; campaign in partnership with disabled people, allies and supporters for a society that provides equality to disabled people; raise resources to support delivery of strategic objectives; achieve this through a well run organisation with reference to our values and good practice.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Bangladesh
  • China
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Kenya
  • Liberia
  • Pakistan
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Philippines
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • Sri Lanka
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • Uganda
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 1992: Standard registration
  • 28 September 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LEONARD CHESHIRE DISABILITY (Working name)
  • THE LEONARD CHESHIRE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carl Uminski Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Holly Spiers Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Austen Reid Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Stuart Secker Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Stephen Billingham Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
John Cowman Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Valerie Todd Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
David Green Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Julian Spurling Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Neil Goulden Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
David Porter Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Michele Golden Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £151.63m £153.81m £158.45m £152.57m £151.82m
Total expenditure £166.33m £161.54m £163.29m £162.29m £151.31m
Income from government contracts £133.30m £131.29m £133.56m £141.82m £95.11m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.73m £3.24m £93.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.01m £7.33m £7.61m £4.50m £2.97m
Income - Other trading activities £608.00k £139.00k £135.00k £17.00k £5.00k
Income - Charitable activities £140.48m £141.13m £145.67m £146.89m £140.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £3.45m £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £237.00k £151.00k £135.00k £104.00k £340.00k
Income - Other £1.30m £5.06m £4.89m £1.07m £7.92m
Income - Legacies £3.75m £3.89m £6.28m £3.51m £1.81m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £157.47m £157.73m £159.32m £160.25m £148.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.33m £3.64m £3.29m £1.63m £997.00k
Expenditure - Governance £487.00k £530.00k £546.00k £659.00k £845.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £14.72m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.53m £159.00k £674.00k £408.00k £1.65m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £92.55m £89.26m £86.87m £81.29m £68.02m
Long-term investments £6.10m £6.36m £4.64m £4.76m £4.33m
Other assets £35.97m £28.90m £29.28m £25.60m £33.74m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£403.00k -£1.95m -£33.00k -£8.00k £62.00k
Total liabilities £24.93m £27.18m £28.55m £27.98m £21.98m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF DOMICILIARY CARE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WITHIN BEDFORDSHIRE
Registration history
  • 13 July 1992 : Standard registration
  • 28 September 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
REGUS
THE NEWS BUILDING
3 LONDON BRIDGE STREET
LONDON
SE1 9SG
Phone:
02032420200