NORTH LUFFENHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants given to the church, village school & to pupils moving onto secondary education & those in further education. The poor & needy have received grants at Christmas time for fuel costs; money is set aside for help during the year. The 6 properties, rented land & paddock are supervised by agent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rutland
Governance
- 05 November 1963: Standard registration
- NORTH LUFFENHAM VILLAGE TRUST (Working name)
- NORTH LUFFENHAM THE TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- NORTH LUFFENHAM TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- THE TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB SEWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Liliane Coogan | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter King | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Timothy Canham | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Anker | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Arthur Madgwick | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mick Coogan | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MYRA WHITTAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DEREK WILLIAM BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.11k | £63.15k | £64.39k | £67.05k | £64.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.56k | £53.03k | £42.28k | £43.20k | £63.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 SEP 2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, RELIEF IN NEED AND THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH IN NORTH LUFFENHAM IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (1) ONE QUARTER OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSE OF: (A) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHOSE PRIMARY RESIDENCE IS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND (B) PROVIDING ITEMS SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR SCHOOLS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) ONE HALF OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED: (A) FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (B) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (I) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM, OR (II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THOSE IN NEED. (C) THE TRUSTEES MAY, AT THEIR DISCRETION, ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (I) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (II) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3) ONE QUARTER OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE PAID BY THE TRUSTEES TO THE CHURCHWARDENS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF NORTH LUFFENHAM FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN. THE CHURCHWARDENS MAY INVEST ANY MONIES NOT REQUIRED FOR THIS PURPOSE IN ANY ONE YEAR IN A SEPARATE FUND ENTITLED CHURCH REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT FUND. (4) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME CANNOT BE APPLIED FOR THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THEY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Digby Drive
North Luffenham
Oakham
LE15 8JS
- Phone:
- 01780721033
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window