Trustees SAND GRAVEL AND CLAY PITS CHARITY

Charity Number: 218256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIKE SEVILLE Chair 01 March 2016
None on record
Judith Kivlin Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
PETER COLEMAN Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
PHILIP PARKER Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
NEVILLE JACKSON Trustee 29 May 2014
None on record