SEAGRAVE WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall as a local amenity for a range of activities - local schools and community events and for fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1961: Standard registration
- SEAGRAVE MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- SEAGRAVE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MCDERMOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER BROWN | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian James Franks | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Clare Thorpe | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||
LESLEY ANN TYERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLOTTE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.60k | £29.49k | £28.77k | £29.85k | £41.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.74k | £11.71k | £33.35k | £32.61k | £43.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.84k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE MARCH 11TH. 1954.
Charitable objects
A HALL FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY FACILITIES, LECTURES, CLASSES, GAMES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SEAGRAVE AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SEAGRAVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seagrave Memorial Hall
Green Lane
Seagrave
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 7LU
- Phone:
- 07591986360
- Email:
- seagravevillagehall@mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window