Accounts and annual returns JOHN HERVEY CHAPTER, NO 1260, BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 218370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 August 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 January 2020 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required