TOWN LANDS OF WANTAGE

Charity number: 218441
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

providing almshouses for the people of Wantage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £111,044
Total expenditure: £81,676

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Trinder Chair 24 September 2014
THE BROTHER JOHN FARLEY MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
ALDWORTH LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
KING ALFRED'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: 111 days late
Terence Randall Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Ian Smith Trustee 14 March 2024
None on record
Christina Haddrell Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Michael Haddrell Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Michael Cooper Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Alan Howell Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
IAN MEAD Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
MR TERRY GASHE Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record
WILLIAM ROYCROFT Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
IAN HERMON Trustee 01 March 2000
None on record
ROBERT SHARP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £104.95k £104.34k £45.58k £97.27k £111.04k
Total expenditure £18.91k £20.16k £27.08k £67.79k £81.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 November 2024 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 25 DECEMBER 1832 AND SCHEME OF 26 SEPTEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF NINE ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS, NATIVES OF THE TOWN OF WANTAGE, OR INHABITANTS OF TWENTY YEARS STANDING SUCH PERSONS TO HAVE BEEN HOUSE-KEEPERS FOR FOURTEEN YEARS OR WIDOWS OF SUCH HOUSEKEEPERS.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF WANTAGE
Registration history
  • 24 June 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
133 STOCKHAM PARK
WANTAGE
OX12 9HJ
Phone:
01235767355
Website:

No information available