WORMLEY PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of food vouchers through local stores and utility bill donations. Educational grants for over 18's. Support the RVS hospital transport scheme Bereavement grants Support for community groups located within the boundaries All grants within the old Wormley parish boundaries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 November 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JAMES LARDI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev ASHISH DAVID | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Sheppard | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Diana Martin | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian May Walker | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HELEN BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRIS MAUREEN BANERJEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER RONALD HOUSE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.83k | £12.90k | £12.13k | £12.33k | £12.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.88k | £7.05k | £7.67k | £6.85k | £9.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WORMLEY AS CONSTITUTED IMMEDIATELY BEFORE THE 1ST APRIL 1935 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WORMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 THE OVAL
BROXBOURNE
EN10 6DQ
- Phone:
- 01992 464764
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window