CHARITY OF SARAH JANE WOOD AND MARY ANN GARNETT

Charity number: 218543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Almshouses

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £93,000
Total expenditure: £118,669

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Scott Brooker Trustee 25 January 2024
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
Maria Earl Trustee 19 January 2023
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Mark Hart Trustee 21 April 2018
CHURCH HOUSE, NANTWICH
Received: On time
NANTWICH CHURCHWARDENS' MERGED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NANTWICH
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
NANTWICH PARISH CHURCH PRESERVATION APPEAL TRUST
Received: On time
Lesley Wrenshall Trustee 13 April 2017
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Tim Butterill Trustee 13 April 2017
None on record
NICHOLAS COPELAND Trustee 01 May 2012
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
HELEN WILLIAMS Trustee 01 May 2012
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
JOHN BAKER Trustee
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
CHARLES HARRY CLEWLOW Trustee
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
AMANDA ROMAINE JAMES Trustee
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
JAMES FREDERICK STOTT Trustee
RICHARDSON HOMES
Received: On time
SIR ROGER WILBRAHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF SIR EDMUND WRIGHT CREWE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM HODGKINS
Received: On time
RICHARD JOHN MORGAN - WYNNE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.49k £75.14k £76.24k £82.74k £93.00k
Total expenditure £62.78k £21.53k £28.69k £81.79k £118.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 September 2022 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 September 2022 227 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 July 2021 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 July 2021 163 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE DOWERY
BARKER STREET
NANTWICH
CHESHIRE
CW5 5TE
Phone:
07507 699226
Website:

No information available