WEST KIRBY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity pays small pensions to elderly persons who have lived in the area of the former urban district of Hoylake for at least three years. It also makes one-off payments to persons (whether or not elderly) living in that area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 January 1975: Standard registration
- WEST KIRBY CHARITIES (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Robert Darwent | Chair | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexandra Williams | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Boulton | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre O'Dwyer | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Malpas | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VICKY GAWITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.13k | £24.58k | £25.24k | £26.29k | £26.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.83k | £17.73k | £23.80k | £21.41k | £19.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 JANUARY 1975
Charitable objects
1) RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2) THE PROVISION OF PENSIONS TO POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS.
Area of benefit
FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF HOYLAKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Madeley Drive
West Kirby
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH48 3LB
- Phone:
- 07719949476
- Email:
- westkirbycharity@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window