Financial history THE HEREFORD CORN EXCHANGE FUND

Charity number: 218570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.39k £4.47k £4.56k £4.66k £4.68k
Total expenditure £2.20k £150 £1.55k £2.49k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A