Governing document SIR THOMAS WHITE'S CHARITY
Charity number: 218626

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JULY 1551 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE 21 MAY 1958, 18 DECEMBER 1967, 31 MAY 1973, 10 MARCH 1982, 23 MARCH 1984, 10 JULY 1991 AND 26 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO DISTRIBUTE PART OF INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF EACH OF THE CITIES OR TOWNS OF COVENTRY, NORTHAMPTON, LEICESTER, NOTTINGHAM AND WARWICK.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEE OBJECTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.