Trustees SIR THOMAS WHITE'S CHARITY
Charity number: 218626

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Derek Meredith | Chair | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sinclair Grindal | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jacka | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Trayton Hopkinson | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY EDWARD TYRE FORSYTH | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PETER TRYE MA MSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MICHAEL HARDY F R I C S | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER VINCENT WIGLESWORTH DL FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.