AGE CONCERN BIRSTALL AND WANLIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Age Concern Birstall and Wanlip has limited financial resources and only pays the wages of a qualified cook on Thurs & Fridays. The St. James day centre for elderly people from Mon. to Thurs is administered by Age Concern Leicster Shire and Rutland who pay the wages of the managers and driver/carers. Our charity provide up to 40 meals for elderly people on Fridays. We carry out some fund raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 14 November 1963: Standard registration
- 12 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- ST JAMES DAY CARE CENTRE (Working name)
- BIRSTALL AND WANLIP OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £9.52k | £6.53k | £5.54k | £5.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £16.83k | £13.16k | £13.25k | £16.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 20 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 08 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 27 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1963 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLEY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
THE CIVIL PARISHES OF BIRSTALL AND WANLIP
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window