THOMAS OUFF

Charity number: 218700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of assistance to poor residents of the ancient township of Disley.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024

Total income: £51,811
Total expenditure: £9,307

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE THOS OUFFS & POORS LAND CHARITY (Working name)
  • THOMAS OUFF AND ANOTHER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JACQUELINE PATTERSON Chair 04 November 2016
None on record
Eugenia Margaret Windsor Trustee 16 December 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £2 £2 £2 £2 £51.81k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2023 17 April 2024 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 27 JULY 1937
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF DISLEY
Registration history
  • 05 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Disley Parish Council
19 OFF Buxton Old Road
Disley
STOCKPORT
SK12 2BB
Phone:
01663762726
Website:

No information available