COURTAULD HOMES OF REST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To administer 20 (twenty) almshouses for occupation by senior citizens who have lived or worked in Halstead for not less than 25 (twenty five) years with priority given to former employees of Samuel Courtauld & Co.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 07 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY SHELTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Trevor Root FGRA | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wade | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILSON MINERS | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|||||
George Courtauld | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE JACQUELINE CANNON | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS G COURTAULD, | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALAN ROBERTSON | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PATRICK BUTLER DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.62k | £66.40k | £68.30k | £168.59k | £124.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.30k | £57.38k | £168.65k | £165.37k | £119.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OR DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH JULY, 1923
Charitable objects
TWENTY HOMES OF REST AND THE MAINTENANCE THEREOF FOR PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO SHALL HAVE RESIDED OR WORKED IN HALSTEAD FOR NOT LESS THAN TWENTY FIVE YEARS, AND WHO SHALL BEAR A GOOD CHARACTER FOR HONEST SOBRIETY AND STEADY WORK. (PREFERENCE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO HAVE WORKED AT THE HALSTEAD FACTORY).
Area of benefit
HALSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE READING ROOM
COURTAULDS HOMES OF REST
HEDINGHAM ROAD
HALSTEAD
ESSEX
CO9 2DN
- Phone:
- 01787472945
- Email:
- acb@corderbirch.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window