HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
These are the combined charities of the City of Hereford within the city boundaries of 1972, and Almshouse and grants can only be made to residents living in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 03 April 1964: Standard registration
- HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (INCLUSIVE OF THE HEREFORD MUNICIPAL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
POLLY ANDREWS | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Hugh Brooks | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rhianon Robinson | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Denis Brian Wilcox | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
David Ludwig Howerski | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Foxton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Paul Morris | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Boulter | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Marian Hawkes | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £407.54k | £425.67k | £405.68k | £233.51k | £440.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.68k | £207.40k | £189.21k | £201.54k | £243.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
HEREFORD
Linked charities
- CAROLINE THOMPSON ALMSHOUSES(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- EMMA CAM'S CHARITY(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- GEORGE HOLLOWAY(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- HELEN GLINN(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- HENRY M DREW(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- HERBERT GELDER
- JANE DAVIES(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- JANE DOWLES(APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL BRANCH)
- JOHN ABRAHALL(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- JOHN LEWIS(APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL BRANCH)
- JOHN WALTER(ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY)
- LAZARUS OR SICK MAN'S HOSPITAL(THE ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- PHILIP TRAHERON(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- PRICE'S HOSPITAL(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- PROVIDENT OLD WOMEN'S PENSION CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- RICHARD GARDINER'S APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- RICHARD GARDINER'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- RICHARD VICARS(ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY)
- SARAH WARD(APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL BRANCH)
- ST GILES'S HOSPITAL(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- SYMONDS'S PENSION CHARITY(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- THE ANNIE HALL FUND(ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY)
- THE CHARITY OF ALICE ROBERTS FOR ALMSHOUSES
- THE DUKE OF CHANDOS FOR ST GILES'S HOSPITAL(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- THE DUKE OF CHANDOS FOR THE POOR(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- THE EMILY MERRICK FUND(ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY)
- THOMAS SYMONDS(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- TRINITY HOSPITAL(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- WILLIAM BRYDGES(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- WILLIAM HARPER(APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL BRANCH)
- WILLIAM LEINTHALL(ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
- WILLIAMS'S HOSPITAL(ALMSHOUSE BRANCH)
- 03 April 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 ST. OWEN STREET
HEREFORD
HR1 2JR
- Phone:
- 01432354002
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window