Skip to main content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Register of Charities
englishcymraeg
Log in to online services
  1. Home
Search

Linked charities NAUTILUS WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 218742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Skip to Content
  • Charity overview
  • What, who, how, where
  • Governance
  • Trustees
  • Financial history
  • Assets and liabilities
  • Accounts and annual returns
  • Governing document
  • Linked charities
  • Contact information
Linked charities
  • ANDREW GIBSON MEMORIAL HOME FOR WIDOWS OF SEAMEN
  • BRITISH MERCHANT SEAMEN AND THEIR DEPENDANTS FUND (INCLUDING THE AGED MERCHANT SEAMEN AND THEIR WIDOWS FUND)
  • BRITISH SHIPMASTERS' OFFICER AND WIDOWS' BENEVOLENT FUND
  • CAPTAIN CHARLES FRYATT MEMORIAL FUND (INCLUDING THE MERCHANT NAVY OFFICERS DISTRESS FUND)
  • HUGH ROBERT HARDCASTLE
  • JOHN DAVIES MEMORIAL NURSING HOME
  • LIVERPOOL HOMES FOR AGED MARINERS
  • LIVERPOOL SEAMEN'S PENSION FUND
  • MARGARET ISMAY FUND
  • MERCANTILE MARINE (WIDOWS) FUND
  • MERCHANT NAVY OFFICERS DISTRESS FUND
  • NATIONAL MERCANTILE MARINE FUND
  • NELSON FUND (ALMONERS)
  • VILLAS AND BUNGALOWS
Linked charity 218742-2 ANDREW GIBSON MEMORIAL HOME FOR WIDOWS OF SEAMEN
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 14 FEBRUARY 1907 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 8 JULY 1966 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
BED SITTING ROOM AND COOKING FACILITIES FOR AGED AND NEEDY WIDOWS OF MERCHANT NAVY SEAMEN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 04 November 1963 : Standard registration
  • 20 October 2009 : Removed
  • 20 October 2009 : Asset transfer out

Print charity details Loading
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

  • Cookies
  • Accessibility
All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated
© Crown copyright