ZOUCH AND BEAUMONT STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the charity are to maintain the building and fabric of the historic church of St Marys and All Saints at Stoughton in which to facilitate the advancement and worship for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1963: Standard registration
- CHURCH LAND (Previous name)
- STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY (Previous name)
- STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- STOUGHTON CHURCH LAND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Lount | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Richmond | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Carolyn Hollingworth | Trustee | 11 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £4.69k | £5.30k | £5.54k | £8.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £3.20k | £10.00k | £981 | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
VOLUMES/REPORTS SEE REP VOL. 32 PT V P 292 NULL AS AMENDED 01 APRIL 2024
Charitable objects
THE INCOME BE SOLELY FOR THE REPAIR, INSURE, MAINTAIN AND UPKEEP OF ST MARY AND ALL SAINTS CHURCH, STOUGHTON, LEICESTERSHIRE TO INCLUDE NOT ONLY THE BUILDING FOR WORSHIP BUT ALSO THE CHURCHYARD AND THE BOUNDARY WALLS, FENCES AND DITCHES OF THE CHURCH PROPERTY IN PERPETUITY
Area of benefit
STOUGHTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 GAULBY LANE
STOUGHTON
LEICESTER
LE2 2FL
- Phone:
- 0116 2710278
- Email:
- a.hollingworth@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window