MEALS ON WHEELS (STOKE ON TRENT)

Charity number: 218791
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of hot dinners to persons unable to produce them for themselves.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £112,156
Total expenditure: £122,030

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Frank Bailey Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £79.49k £89.48k £105.91k £112.97k £112.16k
Total expenditure £85.47k £84.94k £94.57k £104.47k £122.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Laburnum Close
Blythe Bridge
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST11 9NF
Phone:
01782395213
Website:

No information available