THE GRACEWELL FOSTER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF SHELTERED HOUSING FOR SINGLE LADIES OVER 55 YEARS OLD WITH LIMITED MEANS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 28 June 1963: Standard registration
- GRACEWELL HOMES FOSTER TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD RODGERS | Chair | 22 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Holland | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Marianka Bowles | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Pozzi | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEIDRE ANNE HELEN MATTISON | Trustee | 28 January 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.55k | £346.18k | £367.46k | £365.46k | £414.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.32k | £309.27k | £412.45k | £344.80k | £390.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 December 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2021
(These accounts |
29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/04/1978 AS AMENDED ON 13/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR SPINSTERS OR WIDOWS OF LIMITED FINANCIAL MEANS AND OF GOOD CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
271 Wake Green Road
Moseley
BIRMINGHAM
B13 9XL
- Phone:
- 01217784015
- Email:
- gracewell.foster@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window