Accounts and annual returns EASTBOURNE AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 218830
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 14 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 21 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2007 17 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 23 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2006 11 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 08 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 26 April 2006 On Time