Financial history EASTBOURNE AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity Number: 218830
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £1.50m £1.52m £1.82m £1.66m £1.85m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.46m £1.51m £1.66m £1.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £89.70k £240.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.54m £1.57m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £18.12k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £27.65k £36.53k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £81.00k £222.38k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.65m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £18.42k £28.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0