KIRBY MUXLOE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a well-maintained hall available for hire for use by individuals and organisations for social, sporting, cultural, public and/or other purposes which the management committee believe to be of benefit to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 May 1963: Standard registration
- KIRBY MUXLOE VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirby Muxloe Parish Council | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.91k | £19.72k | £15.14k | £22.43k | £24.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.35k | £14.21k | £17.27k | £25.22k | £21.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE 6TH AUGUST 1948
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KIRBY MUXLOE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KIRBY MUXLOE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Newquay Close
HINCKLEY
LE10 1XN
- Phone:
- 01455618122
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window