HATCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Local & Religious Organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 09 October 1963: Standard registration
- THE HATCH CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bemjamin Doggett | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Smith | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bagg | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Sharp | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Flisher | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID HUMPHREY | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARSHALL PETER OSBORNE | Trustee | 11 February 2004 |
|
|||||
DAVID LEONARD HUMPHREY | Trustee | 03 December 1991 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £11.16k | £8.53k | £29.07k | £31.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.62k | £11.88k | £14.28k | £15.67k | £22.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 13TH JUNE 1913 AND WILL PROVED 27TH JULY 1933, SCHEME DATED 14 OCTOBER 2004 as amended on 25 Jul 2024 as amended on 27 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
1. SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 19 THE PRESERVATION OF THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME. 2. TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED OUT BY THE PARISH CHURCH OF LENHAM. 3. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LENHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYES VIEW
32 OLD SCHOOL CLOSE
LENHAM
MAIDSTONE
ME17 2HD
- Phone:
- 01622859069
- Email:
- HAYESVIEW@BTCONNECT.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window