FISHTOFT ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES

Charity Number: 218939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide financial support to the 'poor and needy' and also educational grants to those in further education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £4,935
Total expenditure: £4,148

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY BOARDMAN Chair 29 October 1992
None on record
Richard Geoffrey Lenton Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Christine Senior Trustee 09 September 2022
None on record
Emma Victoria Swift Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Paul Skinner Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAMSON Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
DEBBIE HOLDEN Trustee 24 July 2012
None on record
MR MICHAEL BRADER Trustee 21 February 2006
None on record
ANN WOODS Trustee 04 November 1998
BOSTON AND DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND
Received: On time
Rev MARC COOPER Trustee 18 June 1996
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £4.30k £4.40k £4.31k £4.62k £4.93k
Total expenditure £4.43k £3.30k £2.85k £3.37k £4.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 16 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 2 MARCH 1877, 19 FEBRUARY 1897 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 1905
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY
Area of benefit
FISHTOFT
Registration history
  • 03 July 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
237 Church Green Road
Fishtoft
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE21 0RP
Phone:
07983771620
Website:

No information available