Accounts and annual returns CANADIAN VETERANS ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (BILLY BUTLIN'S TRUST FUND)

Charity number: 218949
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 07 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required