Financial history OAKENGATES AND DISTRICT OLD FOLKS OUTING AND WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 218977
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.45k £5.85k £9.10k £7.94k £14.08k
Total expenditure £9.70k £6.57k £5.72k £9.65k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A