GOODWICK OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides outings and leisure activities for local pensioners of the Goodwick area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 26 June 1966: Standard registration
- GOODWICK SENIOR CITIZENS COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Stokes | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Royston Morgans | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lai Wheatley | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ann Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN NEIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOE D'CRUZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MEGAN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOIRA LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | £370 | £275 | £1.40k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76k | £590 | £444 | £1.42k | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2023 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2023 | 612 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 July 2023 | 977 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND FEBRUARY, 1966.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE IN THE TOWN OF GOODWICK BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
GOODWICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Swn Y Mor
Jacksons Way
GOODWICK
Dyfed
SA64 0EN
- Phone:
- 01348872299
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window