THE HARBORNE PARISH LANDS CHARITY

Charity Number: 219031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY WORKS WITHIN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HARBORNE (HARBORNE & SMETHWICK AND PARTS OF QUINTON AND BEARWOOD). IT PROVIDES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS WHICH SUPPORT PEOPLE IN THE AREA AND ALSO PROVIDES HOUSING WITH SUPPORT FOR 100 ELDELY OR DISABLED PEOPLE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Sandwell

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 1970: Standard registration
  • 22 April 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 22 April 2003: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HARBORNE AND SMETHWICK CHARITABLE TRUST Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.44m £1.45m £1.57m £1.66m £1.87m
Total expenditure £1.30m £1.28m £1.51m £1.83m £2.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £850.96k £870.61k £901.03k £956.53k £1.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £587.03k £580.02k £667.32k £707.08k £783.85k
Income - Other £319 £2.45k £2 £361 £529
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.08m £1.27m £1.46m £1.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £260.50k £198.67k £237.19k £375.36k £271.44k
Expenditure - Governance £55.04k £47.62k £57.46k £68.36k £78.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £83.22k £96.00k £163.72k £230.26k £286.60k
Expenditure - Investment management £260.50k £198.67k £237.19k £375.36k £271.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £4.56m £14.66m £5.27m £4.31m £15.39m
Long-term investments £15.44m £5.74m £14.56m £16.31m £5.93m
Other assets £1.72m £2.10m £2.31m £2.31m £1.92m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £458.61k £317.42k £335.42k £434.28k £478.15k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 21 MAY 1979 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE EXCURSIONS WITH A TEA FOR THE RESIDENTS AND STAFF OF THE ALMSHOUSES AT SMETHWICK BELONGING TO THE PARISH LANDS CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SMETHWICK.
Registration history
  • 03 February 1970 : Standard registration
  • 22 April 2003 : Removed
  • 22 April 2003 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
HARBORNE PARISH LANDS CHARITY
109 COURT OAK ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B17 9AA
Phone:
01214261600