BUXTON COTTAGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing subsidised accomodation for elderly residents in the Mansfield area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Cordin | Chair | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mary Smith | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Maria Pop | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY HOWARTH | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROBERT COPESTAKE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BEELEY | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.46k | £45.41k | £45.28k | £47.07k | £51.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.05k | £42.05k | £43.63k | £54.04k | £182.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON THE 27TH. SEPT. 1946.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF DWELLINGS FOR OLD MEN AND WOMEN OF THE MIDDLE CLASS WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN MANSFIELD FOR TEN YEARS.
Area of benefit
MANSFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHACKLOCKS LLP
ST PETER'S HOUSE
BRIDGE STREET
MANSFIELD
NOTTS
NG18 1AL
- Phone:
- 01623626141
- Email:
- marionv@shacklocks.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window