DALE'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- DALES AND THEALES CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186 | |
|
Total expenditure | £130 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 06 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REP. VOL. 32. PT. 4 PAGE 628 SCHEME 7TH FEBRUARY, 1933 RELATING TO WILL OF WILLIAM DALE 1667.
Charitable objects
1). 20S PER ANNUM TO THE POOR OF THE TOWN. 2). 10S PER ANNUM TO THE SCHOOL. 3). 20S PER ANNUM TO THE BELL-RINGERS. 4). RESIDUE IS DISTRIBUTED IN SMALL SUMS AT DISCRETION OF TRUSTEE.
Area of benefit
HAGWORTHINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window