Accounts and annual returns MEMORIAL HALL FELINFACH

Charity number: 219149
Charity reporting is overdue by 776 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 45 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 45 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 410 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 410 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 776 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 776 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required