THE POORS LAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY HOLDS 10.7 ACRES OF LAND. OF THIS, THERE ARE 14 ALLOTMENTS RENTED OUT AT MODEST CHARGE AND THE REMAINDER IS LET TO A FARMER AT AN APPROPRIATE RENT. EACH YEAR MONEY IS GIVEN TO A PENSIONERS GROUP WITHIN THE VILLAGE TO ENABLE THEM TO CARRY ON WITH THEIR ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 September 1963: Standard registration
- CLAYBROOKE POORS LAND CHARITIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROBIN DEACON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Leigh Halford | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Leaver | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lenihan | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Vance | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Benford Mrs | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £820 | £5.28k | £3.42k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £673 | £3.63k | £2.97k | £1.67k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 NOVEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 2010.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CLAYBROOKE MAGNA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OF DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CLAYBROOK MAGNA
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Manor Road
Claybrooke Magna
LUTTERWORTH
Leicestershire
LE17 5AY
- Phone:
- 07922151729
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window