PRISON ADVICE AND CARE TRUST (PACT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pact supports people affected by imprisonment to cope and to make a fresh start, including prisoners, people with convictions, their children and families. Our work reduces harm and reoffending. We work in prisons of all types, in courts and in communities. We reduce the risk of suicide and self-harm, safeguard children and vulnerable adults, and maintain and strengthen family relationships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£10,231,000
Donations and legacies | £513.00k | |
Charitable activities | £9.68m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £37.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,911,000
Raising funds | £312.00k | |
Charitable activities | £10.60m | |
Other | £0 |
£68,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £312.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.60m |
People

382 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
745 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Funds received from 1101375 KIDS VIP
- 10 June 2014: Funds received from 251847 PRISONERS FAMILIES AND FRIENDS SERVICE
- 18 November 2014: Funds received from 1135894 STRING OF PEARLS PROJECT
- 01 May 2015: Funds received from 1110316 LITTLEHEY VISITORS CENTRE ASSOCIATION
- 19 December 2017: Funds received from 1076744 TIME FOR FAMILIES
- 14 January 2018: Funds received from 1058259 SEND PLAY PROJECT AND VISITORS CENTRE ASSOCIATION
- 22 July 2021: Funds received from 276844 MISS S M G ROSS TRUST
- THE BOURNE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE CATHOLIC SOCIAL SERVICE FOR PRISONERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor James McManus | Chair | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clayton-Hoar | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kuljit Sandhu | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hattersley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bradford | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Maria Elizabeth Robertson | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Horsted | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cleo Adele Metcalf | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Gordon | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Leman | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Harriott | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.23m | £8.58m | £6.28m | £8.09m | £10.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29m | £6.45m | £7.02m | £9.46m | £10.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.43m | £4.63m | £5.30m | £4.66m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £341.00k | £130.00k | £182.00k | £296.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £466.00k | £755.00k | £354.00k | £425.00k | £513.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.76m | £7.82m | £5.92m | £6.97m | £9.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £15.00k | £37.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £182.00k | £67.00k | £131.00k | £185.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.17m | £6.31m | £6.79m | £9.23m | £10.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £125.00k | £145.00k | £228.00k | £234.00k | £312.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.00k | £27.00k | £26.00k | £0 | £28.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £19.00k | £15.00k | £423.00k | £7.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £93.00k | £116.00k | £11.00k | £503.00k | £430.00k | |
|
Other assets | £3.83m | £6.02m | £4.98m | £3.68m | £3.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.18m | £1.24m | £1.24m | £1.41m | £1.36m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1/9/1939 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11/10/1965 AND 5/7/1966 AND A CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 20/7/1973, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/4/2000 as amended on 17 May 2023 as amended on 17 May 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION. 2. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND CHILDREN OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION. 3. TO WORK FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P A C T
The Employment Academy
29 Peckham Road
London
SE5 8UA
- Phone:
- 02077359535
- Email:
- info@prisonadvice.org.uk
- Website:
-
prisonadvice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window