THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To safeguard the welfare, interests and memory of those who are serving or who have served in the Armed Forces. One of the largest membership organisations in the UK, recognised as the custodians of Remembrance and also run the annual Poppy Appeal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£147,061,000
Donations and legacies | £83.22m | |
Charitable activities | £31.57m | |
Other trading activities | £23.93m | |
Investments | £7.76m | |
Other | £590.00k |
Total expenditure:
£180,628,000
Raising funds | £46.90m | |
Charitable activities | £133.73m | |
Other | £0 |
£6,620,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £481,377 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £46.90m | |
Charitable expenditure | £133.73m |
People

1649 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
55000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 32 |
£70k to £80k | 11 |
£80k to £90k | 11 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Belize
- Brazil
- Chile
- Cyprus
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Japan
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Malta
- Monaco
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 10 July 1977: Standard registration
- POPPY APPEAL (Working name)
- THE LEGION (Working name)
- BRITISH LEGION (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION (CORPORATE BODY) (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Atkins DL | Chair | 18 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Major James Sibbald | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|||||
John Thornhill | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Harrison | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HARRIS | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Jan Buxton | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Lee | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Lambert | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Astruc | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monica Risam | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Owen | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH BUTLER | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE SORKIN MA MBA | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.88m | £143.11m | £137.36m | £153.53m | £147.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.68m | £160.97m | £141.83m | £151.85m | £180.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.03m | £3.71m | £2.88m | £1.36m | £481.38k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £101.32m | £87.12m | £77.48m | £96.08m | £83.22m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £22.94m | £18.85m | £24.16m | £21.78m | £23.93m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £44.62m | £31.56m | £29.13m | £27.52m | £31.57m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.62m | £5.51m | £5.36m | £6.36m | £7.76m | |
|
Income - Other | £391.00k | £69.00k | £1.23m | £1.79m | £590.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £21.79m | £19.66m | £23.77m | £28.11m | £23.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £138.19m | £122.78m | £103.73m | £109.12m | £133.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £43.49m | £38.20m | £38.10m | £42.74m | £46.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.09m | £1.40m | £1.20m | £1.25m | £836.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £12.21m | £5.33m | £5.45m | £5.71m | £4.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £449.00k | £404.00k | £448.00k | £485.00k | £447.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £102.38m | £86.03m | £83.31m | £82.78m | £83.59m | |
|
Long-term investments | £235.92m | £235.86m | £251.76m | £240.27m | £243.43m | |
|
Other assets | £78.35m | £70.27m | £80.46m | £85.81m | £55.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.63m | -£11.03m | -£3.56m | -£1.07m | -£1.36m | |
|
Total liabilities | £38.21m | £30.56m | £32.16m | £29.67m | £30.69m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 21 APR 1925 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 10 APR 1979 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 27 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 30 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE NEED AND TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES (DEFINED IN CLAUSE 2) AND THEIR SPOUSES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS; (B) TO RELIEVE NEED AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF THE SPOUSES, CHILDREN, DEPENDANTS AND IMMEDIATE FAMILY MEMBERS OF BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE DIED OR BEEN SEVERLEY INJURED; (C) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS TO SPOUSES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS CAUSED BY THE ABSENCE OF THOSE SERVING IN THE ROYAL NAVY, ARMY AND RAF ON REGULAR, RESERVE OR AUXILIARY ENGAGEMENTS; (D) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SCHEMES FOR THE RESETTLEMENT, REHABILITATION, RETRAINING AND SHELTERED EMPLOYMENT OF BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR SPOUSES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS; (E) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE COMMEMORATION OF THOSE WHO HAVE DIED WHILST ON ACTIVE SERVICE WITH THE ARMED FORCES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BRITISH LEGION AREA HOUSES AT KETTERING
- BRITISH LEGION AREA HOUSES AT LAUNCESTON
- BRITISH LEGION AREA HOUSES AT ROCHDALE
- BRITISH LEGION AREA HOUSES CHARITIES
- CROWTHORNE BRANCH THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
- ROYAL BRITISH LEGION - PILLING
- ROYAL BRITISH LEGION HOUSING ESTATE
- THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION CONVALESCENT HOME SOUTHPORT
- THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION HOMES
- 10 July 1977 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
199 BOROUGH HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE1 1AA
- Phone:
- 02032072100
- Email:
- sgray@britishlegion.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window