TENBURY AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides help with medical services primarily through the District Nursing Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Karen Bryant | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Maria Mina Baxter | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Margaret Ann Morris | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Redding | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Emma Carole Grosvenor | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Elaine Kirkland Padwick | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CAROLINE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £1.17k | £1.80k | £2.66k | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £583 | £1.87k | £2.43k | £2.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 16 DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISHES OF BOCKLETON, KNIGHTON-ON-TEME, KYRE, ROCHFORD, STOKE BLISS AND TENBURY ALL IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OF FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES. SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wayside House
Worcester Road
Burford
Tenbury Wells
WR15 8AS
- Phone:
- 01584 810681
- Email:
- elaine.padwick@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window