Accounts and annual returns WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT MOBILE PHYSIOTHERAPY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 219323
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 11 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time